Global Patent Index - EP 0894328 B1

EP 0894328 B1 2000-05-17 - FUSE BOX FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

FUSE BOX FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

SICHERUNGSBOX FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

BOITE DE FUSIBLES POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0894328 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97917255 A

Priority

  • DE 9700414 W
  • DE 19615561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19615561A1] A fuse box for motor vehicles has a housing (3) for receiving at least one electrical fuse (19, 35) which protects a consumer or wire section. The fuse box (1) may be secured on the battery of a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/20; B60R 16/02; H01H 85/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H01H 85/044 (2006.01); H01H 85/06 (2006.01); H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01H 85/24 (2006.01); H01H 85/50 (2006.01); H01H 85/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/044 (2013.01); H01H 85/20 (2013.01); H01H 85/24 (2013.01); H01H 85/2045 (2013.01); H01H 85/205 (2013.01); H01H 2085/025 (2013.01); H01H 2085/208 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615561 A1 19971023; DE 19615561 C2 19981210; AU 2566697 A 19971112; BR 9708586 A 19990803; CN 1134038 C 20040107; CN 1216633 A 19990512; EP 0894328 A1 19990203; EP 0894328 B1 20000517; ES 2146092 T3 20000716; JP H11509961 A 19990831; PT 894328 E 20001031; US 6396380 B1 20020528; WO 9740510 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701722

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100305

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090306

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-03-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020301

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146092 T3

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701722 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980729

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE