Global Patent Index - EP 0894442 B1

EP 0894442 B1 2001-04-11 - Article of clothing

Title (en)

Article of clothing

Title (de)

Bekleidungsstück

Title (fr)

Article vestimentaire

Publication

EP 0894442 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114482 A

Priority

DE 19733125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894442A2] A garment, e.g. a jacket, a suit or trousers, incorporates outer fabric (12) and a lining (13) joined to the outer fabric (12) by means of an adhesive. The outer fabric (12) consists of a material that can be washed in a washing machine, as does the lining (13) which is also elastic. The outer fabric is made of polyester fibres and shorn wool, and the lining is made of a bi-elastic material and contains polyamide or polyester fibres.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 1/02; A41D 27/06; A41D 27/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/02 (2006.01); A41D 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/06 (2013.01); A41D 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894442 A2 19990203; EP 0894442 A3 19990811; EP 0894442 B1 20010411; AT 200393 T 20010415; DE 19733125 C1 19990304; ES 2157104 T3 20010801

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PRADIP PATTNI

2003-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021026

2003-03-19 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20021026

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PRADIP PATTNI

2002-03-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PRADIP PATTNI

- Effective date: 20020111

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GREIFF MODE G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157104 T3

2001-08-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2001-04-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200393 T 20010415

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991213

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 41D 1/02 A, 6A 41D 27/24 B, 6A 41D 27/06 B

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI