Global patent index - EP 0894457 A3

EP 0894457 A3 2000-05-17 - Seating system for grandstands

Title (en)

Seating system for grandstands

Title (de)

Bestuhlungssystem für Tribünen

Title (fr)

Système de chaises pour tribunes

Publication

EP 0894457 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113756 A

Priority

  • DE 19733384 A
  • DE 29713760 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894457A2] The seat units (1) each have a seat (2) and a seat holder (15) locally fixed on a platform structure and having a swivel bearing (16) with vertical swivel axis (A) so that the seat can be set in different viewing directions. The seat holder has stops to restrict the adjustment area of the seat. The axial bearing of the swivel bearing is formed as a pressure load bearing remote from the axis and having a first seat bearing part on the platform side enclosing the swivel axis at a radial spacing, and a second bearing part on the seat supporting the first bearing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/12; A47C 1/16; A47C 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/12 (2006.01); A47C 1/16 (2006.01); A47C 3/18 (2006.01); E04H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/12 (2013.01); A47C 3/18 (2013.01); E04H 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894457 A2 19990203; EP 0894457 A3 20000517; EP 0894457 B1 20030502; AT 238723 T 20030515; DE 29713760 U1 19971002; DE 59808129 D1 20030605

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-07-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020611

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 1/12 A, 7A 47C 3/18 B, 7A 47C 1/16 B

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI