Global Patent Index - EP 0894464 A3

EP 0894464 A3 2000-04-05 - Hinge for plate glass doors

Title (en)

Hinge for plate glass doors

Title (de)

Band für rahmenlose Ganzglastüren

Title (fr)

Paumelle pour portes entièrement vitrées.

Publication

EP 0894464 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113586 A

Priority

DE 19733039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894464A2] The hinge has parts (4,12,13) of geometric cross-section connected together with force or positive locking action whereby the parts are formed as fastening arms and in the middle of the arm at an angle of 90 degs. is a further arm (4) angled by 90 degs. Two spacers project from the fastening arm (13,15) at an angle of 90 degrees and the free end (36) of the angled arm (4) is connected between the ends of the spacers mounted rotatable through a connecting element (14). Compensating members (10) can be provided on the fastening arms for fastening. The fastening arms are welded or soldered to the angled arms or spacers. The hinge can be made from stainless steel, aluminium, plastics or brass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; E05D 5/02; E05D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/27 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894464 A2 19990203; EP 0894464 A3 20000405; DE 19733039 C1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/36 A

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05D 5/02 B

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05D 5/06 B

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020702

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-26 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1999-02-12 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI