Global Patent Index - EP 0894466 A3

EP 0894466 A3 2000-04-05 - Hinge for plate glass doors

Title (en)

Hinge for plate glass doors

Title (de)

Band für rahmenlose Glastüren

Title (fr)

Paumelle pour portes entièrement vitrées

Publication

EP 0894466 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113993 A

Priority

DE 19733037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894466A2] The hinge is made from parts of round cross-section connected together with keyed or force locking action. The parts are made from two fastening members (7) with spacers (5) inbetween and at the same time two spaced hinge members (6) are mounted rotatable through a hinge pin which passes through the fastening members, hinge eyes (4) and spacers (5). The hinge members can be angled and can be connected to a distance member (2) set between same by welding or soldering. The hinge can be made from stainless steel, brass, plastics or aluminium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; E05D 5/02; E05D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894466 A2 19990203; EP 0894466 A3 20000405; DE 19733037 C1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060301

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030725

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-26 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1999-02-12 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI