Global Patent Index - EP 0894532 A3

EP 0894532 A3 2000-07-26 - Method and apparatus for the extraction and handling of biological liquids from thin walled receptacles

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the extraction and handling of biological liquids from thin walled receptacles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Extraktion bzw. Handhabung von biologischen Flüssigkeiten in dünnwändigen Behältern

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'extraction et la manipulation de liquides biologiques contenus dans des récipients à parois minces

Publication

EP 0894532 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500181 A

Priority

ES 9701710 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894532A2] The invention provides apparatus which comprises a minimum of two sections which can be interengaged with one another, one section being capable of being moved relative to the other, and having means for radially and axially holding the thin-walled tubular receptacle containing a biological liquid sample and being provided with means to ensure that on engagement of the two sections with one another the thin-walled receptacle is ruptured at the required points, the said sections comprising components of the device which are joint structures for the purpose of squeezing the thin-walled receptacle after the receptacle has been ruptured, the section directly receiving the thin-walled receptacle being transparent, so as to make it possible to read identifying marks on the said sample-holding receptacle from without. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); A61B 5/15 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 99/00 (2010.01); B67B 7/54 (2006.01); G01N 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 1/10 (2006.01); G01N 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/502 (2013.01); B01L 3/0296 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894532 A2 19990203; EP 0894532 A3 20000726; EP 0894532 B1 20040922; AR 015411 A1 20010502; AT 276828 T 20041015; BR 9802827 A 19991103; BR 9802827 B1 20101103; CZ 290694 B6 20020911; CZ 9802298 A3 19990217; DE 69826385 D1 20041028; DE 69826385 T2 20050929; ES 2140311 A1 20000216; ES 2140311 B1 20001016; ES 2227791 T3 20050401; JP 2927784 B2 19990728; JP H11105985 A 19990420; SK 101098 A3 19990211; SK 282943 B6 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170730

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170730

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170730

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69826385

2017-08-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69826385

- Representative's name: KLUNKER IP PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160606

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160506

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2006-04-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227791 T3

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826385 P 20041028

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROBITAS PHARMA, S.A.

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI