Global Patent Index - EP 0894553 B1

EP 0894553 B1 2002-11-06 - Apparatus for bending a hollow profile with a clamp

Title (en)

Apparatus for bending a hollow profile with a clamp

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Biegen eines Hohlprofiles mit einem Niederhalter

Title (fr)

Appareil pour plier un profil creux avec un élément de serrage

Publication

EP 0894553 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113861 A

Priority

DE 19733536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894553A2] The apparatus (1) bends a hollow profile section (2) to form an inner (or distance) frame for an insulating glass pane. It incorporates a guiding and holding unit (3), a bending tool (11), a support element (13) and a holding down unit. The holding down unit is made up of two parts (171, 172). The part (171) located in the bending region (4) is rotatable in the bending direction at least through the bending angle. The axis of rotation (18) of this part of the holding down unit is located in the neutral layer of the profile section, or it is radially offset from this layer towards the interior of the bend. The part (172) of the holding down unit is fixed and precedes the other part (171) in the feed direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/74; B21D 7/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/022 (2006.01); B21D 53/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/022 (2013.01); B21D 53/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894553 A2 19990203; EP 0894553 A3 19990825; EP 0894553 B1 20021106; AT 227178 T 20021115; DE 19733536 A1 19990218; DE 19733536 C2 20011011; US 6023956 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150724

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227178 T

- Effective date: 20150724

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806154

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070724

2006-07-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2003-02-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806154 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227178 T 20021115

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-05-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990918

1999-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI