Global patent index - EP 0894555 A3

EP 0894555 A3 2000-04-19 - Profile rolling machine with supporting frame

Title (en)

Profile rolling machine with supporting frame

Title (de)

Profilrollmaschine mit Kraftrahmen

Title (fr)

Machine à laminer des profilés avec cadre de support

Publication

EP 0894555 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810664 A

Priority

CH 181597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894555A2] The power frame (2) has two yoke plates (21,22) and draw anchors (23,24) arranged in tubes (25,26) connecting the yoke plates. The devices for pushing the one rolling spindle (10) in the direction of the other (1) are partly fixed or supported on one of the yoke plates (21,22). The power frame (2) is so arranged on a machine bed (3) movably in the rolling spindle push direction that no push and rolling forces are transmitted to the machine bed. The power frame is accurately connected at a point firmly with the machine bed. This connection is by means of one of the draw anchors (24) and/or one of the draw anchor tubes (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894555 A2 19990203; EP 0894555 A3 20000419; CH 692382 A5 20020531

INPADOC legal status

2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI