Global Patent Index - EP 0894593 A3

EP 0894593 A3 2001-01-03 - Method for manufacturing mosaic tesserae with an antique appearance, and tesserae manufactured thereby

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing mosaic tesserae with an antique appearance, and tesserae manufactured thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Mosaiksteinen mit antikem Aussehen, und Mosaiksteine hergestellt nach dem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de pierres mosaiques ayant une apparence antique, et pierres mosaiques selon le procédé

Publication

EP 0894593 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98112163 A

Priority

IT MO970132 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894593A2] A method for manufacturing antique mosaic tesserae, comprising the steps of: placing a slab-like matrix (5) under a cutting unit (1), arranging the matrix (5) upside down so that the exposed face is directed away from the unit; scoring the laying side along at least two directions and to a preset and adjustable depth, creating preferential fracture lines (6); fracturing the slab-like matrix (5) scored on the laying face; and tumbling the resulting tesserae in order to round their edges. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/00; B28D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 3/126 (2013.01); B28D 1/00 (2013.01); B28D 1/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894593 A2 19990203; EP 0894593 A3 20010103; EP 0894593 B1 20030312; CN 1094913 C 20021127; CN 1205994 A 19990127; ES 2195235 T3 20031201; IT 1294897 B1 19990423; IT MO970132 A1 19990118; IT MO970132 D0 19970717; PT 894593 E 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-01-13 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402127

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT PT

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL RO

2002-06-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOSAIC TESSERAE WITH AN ANTIQUE APPEARANCE, AND MOSAIC TESSERAE OBTAINABLE THEREBY

2002-06-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOSAIC TESSERAE WITH AN ANTIQUE APPEARANCE, AND MOSAIC TESSERAE OBTAINABLE THEREBY

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GR IT PT

2001-09-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010528;RO PAYMENT 20010528

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT PT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI