Global Patent Index - EP 0894729 B1

EP 0894729 B1 2001-12-19 - Staple for the sealing of sausages

Title (en)

Staple for the sealing of sausages

Title (de)

Verschlussklammer für Würste

Title (fr)

Agrafe de fermeture pour saucisses

Publication

EP 0894729 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500152 A

Priority

ES 9702061 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894729A1] The staple is of a general "U" configuration, and its central branch (2) is provided on its outer face with multiple grooves (3), transversally placed on the said branch (2) and adapted to collaborate with some similar and complimentary ribs (4), placed on the outer edge (5) of the sealing punch (6) of the staple (1) and/or on the sealing die of the corresponding stapling machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/1641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894729 A1 19990203; EP 0894729 B1 20011219; DE 69803016 D1 20020131; DE 69803016 T2 20020502; ES 1037953 U 19980501; ES 1037953 Y 19981101

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050629

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803016 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010112

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI