Global Patent Index - EP 0894876 B1

EP 0894876 B1 2002-09-04 - Roller for a carding machine

Title (en)

Roller for a carding machine

Title (de)

Walze für eine Karde

Title (fr)

Rouleau pour Carde

Publication

EP 0894876 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810678 A

Priority

CH 183897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894876A1] The card roller (10), of fibre-reinforced plastics, has the reinforcement fibres (12) extending at least partially round the roller circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/16 (2006.01); D01G 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/24 (2013.01); D01G 15/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894876 A1 19990203; EP 0894876 B1 20020904; DE 59805385 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805385

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070715

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060117

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLER FOR A CARDING MACHINE

2004-02-11 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLER FOR A CARDING MACHINE

2004-01-14 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLER FOR A CARDING MACHINE

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUETZSCHLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805385 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROLLER FOR A CARDING MACHINE

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010213

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990109

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI