Global Patent Index - EP 0894878 A3

EP 0894878 A3 2000-04-19 - Flock cleaner

Title (en)

Flock cleaner

Title (de)

Flockenreiniger

Title (fr)

Nettoyeur de flocons

Publication

EP 0894878 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810613 A

Priority

  • CH 181997 A
  • CH 182097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894878A2] The flocking cleaner has at least one separating unit over the material transport roller, and a system removes detached matter away from the roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/24 (2006.01); D01G 15/80 (2006.01); D01G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 23/02 (2013.01); D01G 15/24 (2013.01); D01G 15/805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894878 A2 19990203; EP 0894878 A3 20000419; US 6185787 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030920

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI