Global Patent Index - EP 0894896 A3

EP 0894896 A3 2000-05-10 - Papers and cardboard products suitable for laser marking

Title (en)

Papers and cardboard products suitable for laser marking

Title (de)

Lasermarkierbare Papiere und Kartonagen

Title (fr)

Papiers et cartons marquables par laser

Publication

EP 0894896 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113240 A

Priority

DE 19732860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894896A2] Paper and cardboard suitable for laser marking contains micronised linear aromatic polyester and/or linear polyarylene with a particle size of 0.1-100 mu m as absorbent (I) and carbon source. Also claimed is a method of making the materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/14; B41M 1/36; B41M 5/00; D21H 21/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/48 (2006.01); B41M 5/26 (2006.01); D21H 17/46 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 19/24 (2006.01); D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 21/40 (2006.01); D21H 21/50 (2006.01); D21H 21/52 (2006.01); D21H 17/56 (2006.01); D21H 19/42 (2006.01); D21H 19/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/267 (2013.01); D21H 21/22 (2013.01); D21H 21/52 (2013.01); D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 17/56 (2013.01); D21H 19/42 (2013.01); D21H 19/62 (2013.01); D21H 21/40 (2013.01); Y10T 428/254 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31855 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894896 A2 19990203; EP 0894896 A3 20000510; DE 19732860 A1 19990204; JP H11100796 A 19990413; US 6306493 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080318

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070906

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 21H 21/14 A, 7D 21H 21/52 B, 7B 41M 1/36 B, 7B 41M 5/00 B, 7B 41M 5/26 B, 7D 21H 17:33 Z, 7D 21H 19:44 Z

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI