Global patent index - EP 0894912 A3

EP 0894912 A3 2000-06-21 - Concealed cut edge for decorative barge boards

Title (en)

Concealed cut edge for decorative barge boards

Title (de)

Verdeckte Schnittkante für dekorative Traufenblende

Title (fr)

Bord de coupe caché pour bandeau de rive décoratif

Publication

EP 0894912 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305574 A

Priority

  • GB 9716071 A
  • GB 9716822 A
  • GB 9801248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2319275A] A method of cutting a decorative pattern in a barge board 1, or altematively a fascia board or a finial board, made from co-extruded plastics material and having a front face 2, a rear face 3 and a cellular core 4. The cellular core 4 can become stained when exposed by cutting and the present method removes the stained cut edge from the line of sight of the observer. The pattern is cut in the barge board 1 at an acute angle of 45‹-60‹ to the front face 2 and accordingly the portion of the cellular core 4 exposed by cutting the pattern in the barge board 1 is not directly visible from the ground. A small cut 5 is made at right angles to the front face 2 before the angled cut is made to prevent damage to the cut edge from handling. Also provided is a decorative barge board or fascia board or finial board made by the method described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/158 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1585 (2013.01); E04D 13/158 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2319275 A 19980520; GB 2319275 B 19980930; GB 9801248 D0 19980318; EP 0894912 A2 19990203; EP 0894912 A3 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-04-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04D 13/15 A

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWMOND BUILDING PRODUCTS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWMOND BUILDING PRODUCTS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI