Global Patent Index - EP 0894918 B1

EP 0894918 B1 2002-11-06 - Striker for a vehicle lock

Title (en)

Striker for a vehicle lock

Title (de)

Schliessblech für ein Fahrzeugsschloss

Title (fr)

Gâche pour une serrure de véhicule

Publication

EP 0894918 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98114292 A

Priority

IT TO970687 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894918A1] Striker for a vehicle lock comprising an anchoring portion (23) arranged to be fixed to a bodywork portion of the vehicle and an engagement portion (4) arranged to cooperate with a lock closure mechanism; the anchoring portion (23) comprises a metal plate (2) and a coating (16) of elastically deformable material, which allows any direct contact to be avoided between the plate (2) and the bodywork and thereby to reduce the noise produced during the closure operation of the lock. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/40 (2013.01); E05B 85/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894918 A1 19990203; EP 0894918 B1 20021106; BR 9806641 A 20000411; DE 69809149 D1 20021212; DE 69809149 T2 20030724; ES 2186949 T3 20030516; IT 1293661 B1 19990308; IT TO970687 A1 19990201; PL 327780 A1 19990201

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809149

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110730

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050801

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050730

2005-08-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2004-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186949 T3

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809149 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES S.P.A

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010115

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI