Global Patent Index - EP 0894928 B1

EP 0894928 B1 2002-09-11 - Locking device, in particular a mortise lock for the wing of a door or a window

Title (en)

Locking device, in particular a mortise lock for the wing of a door or a window

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung, insbesondere Einsteckschloss für den Flügel einer Tür oder eines Fensters

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture, en particulier serrure à encastrer dans un battant de porte-fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0894928 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401414 A

Priority

FR 9709866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894928A1] The lock, incorporating a sliding long bolt (5) set in the edge of the window, comprises a mortised housing with a nut (14) which rotates about a geometrical axis lying perpendicular to the median plane of the housing. The nut has a hole (15) to receive a drive rod of matching cross-section, rotated by a handle (16) to turn the nut, which has a projecting arm (17) to slide the long bolt. The nut arm is offset relative to the centre of the nut so that it turns about a point (B) which lies further from the long bolt than the nut's axis of rotation (A). The lock also incorporates a component (21) which ensures a direct rotation of the nut arm with no need for an intermediate element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05B 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05B 63/0021 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01); E05B 15/0053 (2013.01); E05B 2015/1664 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894928 A1 19990203; EP 0894928 B1 20020911; DE 69807801 D1 20021017; DE 69807801 T2 20030710; FR 2766866 A1 19990205; FR 2766866 B1 19991008; HU 222225 B1 20030528; HU 9801727 A1 19990528; HU 9801727 D0 19980928

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150611

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807801

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807801 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI