Global Patent Index - EP 0894929 B1

EP 0894929 B1 2002-09-11 - Mounting plate for a fitting, especially for the fixing of a hinge arm to a wall of a furniture

Title (en)

Mounting plate for a fitting, especially for the fixing of a hinge arm to a wall of a furniture

Title (de)

Befestigungsplatte für ein Beschlagteil, vorzugsweise zur Befestigung eines Scharnierarms an einer Tragwand eines Möbels

Title (fr)

Plaque de montage pour une ferrure, en particulier pour la fixation d'un bras de charnière sur une paroi de meuble

Publication

EP 0894929 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106377 A

Priority

DE 29713594 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894929A2] One of the fixture screws (15, 21) supports with its head (15) on a distance piece, the height of which is greater than that of the fixture plate (1) and of which the other serves to clamp the fixture plate to the support wall (20). The distance piece comprises a frame provided with a hole and having a width corresponding to the long hole (10). It is provided with lateral lobes engaging over the edges of the long hole. The height of the frame between its under side and the under side of the lobes is greater than the height of the fixture plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0276 (2013.01); E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10S 16/43 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5322 (2013.01); Y10T 16/554 (2013.01); Y10T 403/1608 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29713594 U1 19971113; AT 223996 T 20020915; BR 9802413 A 19991005; CN 1089843 C 20020828; CN 1206776 A 19990203; CZ 293490 B6 20040512; CZ 9801515 A3 19990217; EP 0894929 A2 19990203; EP 0894929 A3 19990331; EP 0894929 B1 20020911; ES 2183250 T3 20030316; HK 1017043 A1 20030502; HU 9800899 A2 20000428; HU 9800899 A3 20000628; HU 9800899 D0 19980629; JP 2975924 B2 19991110; JP H1150725 A 19990223; PL 326583 A1 19990201; TW 397887 B 20000711; US 6203231 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110408

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223996 T

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-12-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805487

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805487

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183250 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805487 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980407

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223996 T 20020915

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010509

1999-12-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

1999-12-15 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980407

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980407

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980407