Global Patent Index - EP 0894969 A3

EP 0894969 A3 2000-01-12 - Device for treating liquid or gaseous fuels

Title (en)

Device for treating liquid or gaseous fuels

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von flüssigen oder gasförmigen Brennstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour traiter des carburants liquides ou gazeux

Publication

EP 0894969 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114227 A

Priority

DE 19732834 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0894969A2] The arrangement includes a magnetic field generation arrangement (61, 62) with at least one coil, such that, a timewise changing magnetic field is induced in the liquid or gaseous fuel. The coil surrounds a container holding the liquid or gaseous fuel. The arrangement comprises a control system (20) which is functionally connected with the magnetic field generation arrangement. The control system controls the temporal behaviour of the magnetic field depending on at least one parameter. The control arrangement includes an input device (25',25"), by which the at least one parameter can be adjusted to the fluid to be respectively treated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 27/04 (2013.01); F02M 2027/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0894969 A2 19990203; EP 0894969 A3 20000112; DE 19732834 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI