Global Patent Index - EP 0895023 A3

EP 0895023 A3 2000-12-27 - Device for mounting a lamp to a ceiling or to a wall

Title (en)

Device for mounting a lamp to a ceiling or to a wall

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Montage einer Leuchte an einer Decke oder Gebäudewand

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d' une lampe à un plafond ou à un mur

Publication

EP 0895023 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810718 A

Priority

CH 184397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895023A2] The arrangement has a device for electrically connecting the lamp (1) to a supply cable and an attachment element for attaching the lamp to a ceiling (2) or wall. A socket (5) is provided for mounting on the ceiling or wall. An attachment element (4) attached to the lamp has a device for removable attachment to the socket. A device on the socket is provided for removable mounting of the attachment element on the socket. A plug part (22) integrated into the attachment element makes the electrical connection between the lamp and the socket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/02; F21V 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/03 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/03 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21V 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895023 A2 19990203; EP 0895023 A3 20001227

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI