Global Patent Index - EP 0895029 A3

EP 0895029 A3 2000-08-09 - An apparatus with gas burner having safety device against impacts and tilting

Title (en)

An apparatus with gas burner having safety device against impacts and tilting

Title (de)

Ein Gerät mit einem Gasbrenner und Sicherheitseinrichtung gegen Stossen und Kippen

Title (fr)

Un appareil avec un brûleur à gaz et dispositif de sécurité contre des chocs et des renversements

Publication

EP 0895029 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98107133 A

Priority

IT MI971847 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895029A2] A gas-fuelled infrared heat radiator, or in general gas-fuelled heating apparatus, comprises, on an electrical control circuit of a supply valve of the burner, a so-called "tip-over switch", that interrupts the electrical continuity and thus the supply of fuel to the main burner, if the apparatus is tilted further than an established inclination, or is knocked. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24; F23N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/10 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/105 (2013.01); F23N 5/245 (2013.01); F23N 2027/22 (2013.01); F23N 2031/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895029 A2 19990203; EP 0895029 A3 20000809; IT 1294297 B1 19990324; IT MI971847 A1 19990201

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IOLLI, VITTORIO FILIPPO JENNER

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI