Global Patent Index - EP 0895034 B1

EP 0895034 B1 2001-12-12 - Heating system with improved supporting frame and expansion tank arrangement

Title (en)

Heating system with improved supporting frame and expansion tank arrangement

Title (de)

Heizvorrichtung mit verbessertem Stützrahmen und Ausdehnungsgefäss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage avec cadre de support amélioré et avec vase d'expansion

Publication

EP 0895034 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98111477 A

Priority

IT MI970577 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895034A1] The supporting frame (10) for gas-fired wall boilers and the like has a pair of parallel uprights (11,12) connected to each other by transverse elements (13). The expansion tank (17) is arranged in the front portion of the boiler and the supporting frame (10) is provided with two brackets (14,16), the first of which (14) is connected to the lower end of one of the uprights (11 or 12) of the boiler supporting frame (10) whereas the second (16) is connected to the same upright (11 or 12), but above the first bracket (14). The expansion tank (17) is provided with hinging means (18,19) cooperating with corresponding hinging means arranged at the free ends of the two brackets (14,16) to permit the expansion tank to be pivotally connected to the supporting frame (10) and to be rotated about a vertical axis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/02; F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01); F24H 9/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1008 (2013.01); F24H 9/02 (2013.01); F24H 9/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895034 A1 19990203; EP 0895034 B1 20011212; AT 210806 T 20011215; DE 69802875 D1 20020124; DE 69802875 T2 20020801; ES 2169461 T3 20020701; IT 237832 Y1 20000929; IT MI970577 U1 19990129

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030621

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030620

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-06-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-06-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169461 T3

2002-06-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020516

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802875 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB NL

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210806 T 20011215

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIELLO S.P.A.

2001-05-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEATING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED SUPPORTING FRAME AND EXPANSION TANK ARRANGEMENT

2001-05-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEATING SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED SUPPORTING FRAME AND EXPANSION TANK ARRANGEMENT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB NL

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990227

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB NL

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI