Global Patent Index - EP 0895198 B1

EP 0895198 B1 2002-11-13 - Vehicle with a memory for on demand diagnostic data and with a remote controlled central locking device

Title (en)

Vehicle with a memory for on demand diagnostic data and with a remote controlled central locking device

Title (de)

Fahrzeug mit einem Speicher für abrufbare Diagnosedaten und mit einer fernbedienbaren Zentralverriegelung

Title (fr)

Véhicule avec une mémoire pour des données diagnostiques sur demande et avec un dispositif de verrouillage central télécommandé

Publication

EP 0895198 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112121 A

Priority

DE 19732900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895198A2] The road vehicle has a memory that is used to store diagnostic data that is combined with a remotely accessed and interlocked system. Built into the unit is a transmitter that is used to relay data to a central data processing system. Access is obtained by the central station making a request by transmitting a remote specific vehicle identification code. The system may be accessed when the vehicle system is in the sleep mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01); G07C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/085 (2013.01); G07C 5/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895198 A2 19990203; EP 0895198 A3 20001122; EP 0895198 B1 20021113; DE 19732900 A1 19990204; ES 2184174 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806250

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184174 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806250 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI