Global Patent Index - EP 0895235 A3

EP 0895235 A3 2000-06-07 - Magneto-optical recording medium and writing and readout method therefor

Title (en)

Magneto-optical recording medium and writing and readout method therefor

Title (de)

Magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungsmedium und zugehöriges Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabeverfahren

Title (fr)

Milieu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique et méthode d'enregistrement et de reproduction associée

Publication

EP 0895235 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98113900 A

Priority

JP 20119697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895235A2] A magneto-optical recording medium having a writing layer formed on a transparent substrate provided with a groove having a flat bottom surface and a flat land, so that writing or readout is carried out on either the groove or the land only by irradiating a laser beam from the substrate side, wherein the sum ( alpha + beta ) of a phase shift alpha of a reflected light of a readout beam by the substrate and a phase shift beta thereof by a layer structure on the transparent substrate, is made to have an opposite sign to a phase shift gamma by interference of reflected lights from the groove and the land. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 11/10 (2006.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 11/10584 (2013.01); G11B 11/10515 (2013.01); G11B 7/007 (2013.01); G11B 11/10578 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895235 A2 19990203; EP 0895235 A3 20000607; EP 0895235 B1 20090701; DE 69840941 D1 20090813; JP 3433651 B2 20030804; JP H1145470 A 19990216; US 5970027 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69840941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100406

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69840941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-08-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070608

2006-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI