Global Patent Index - EP 0895264 B1

EP 0895264 B1 2000-02-23 - Current control for an inductive load

Title (en)

Current control for an inductive load

Title (de)

Stromregler für eine induktive Last

Title (fr)

Contrôle de courant pour une charge inductive

Publication

EP 0895264 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305816 A

Priority

GB 9716220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895264A1] A current control for an inductive load (10) includes a switch device (11) and a sensor (12) in series with the load. A voltage comparator (15) is connected to operate when the current in the load reaches a desired average value. A digital control (18) measures the time taken for the current to reach this value and maintains the switch device conductive for a further period based on this measured time. Accurate average current control is obtained even if it is not possible to measure the load current when the switch device is non-conductive. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895264 A1 19990203; EP 0895264 B1 20000223; DE 69800081 D1 20000330; DE 69800081 T2 20000914; GB 9716220 D0 19971008

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170721

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170721

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170721

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800081

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-04-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: GOODRICH CONTROL SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-04-11 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-04-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GOODRICH CONTROL SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-03-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GOODRICH CONTROL SYSTEMS, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD., LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 69800081

- Effective date: 20140128

2014-03-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GOODRICH CONTROL SYSTEMS, SOLIHULL, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD., LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 69800081

- Effective date: 20140128

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800081 20000330

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LIMITED

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990317

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI