Global Patent Index - EP 0895410 A3

EP 0895410 A3 2000-02-02 - Ink relocation for color halftones

Title (en)

Ink relocation for color halftones

Title (de)

Tintenverschiebung für Farbhalbtonrasterung

Title (fr)

Repositionnement d'encre pour demi-teintes en couleur

Publication

EP 0895410 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305939 A

Priority

US 90402697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895410A2] An ink relocation postprocess to halftoning algorithms relocates ink drops between neighbouring drop locations in order to reduce local brightness variations. In a first arrangement, ink relocation is suppressed in areas of fine detail. In a second arrangement, edge sharpening is performed after ink relocation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 5/30 (2006.01); G06T 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/46 (2006.01); H04N 1/58 (2006.01); H04N 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895410 A2 19990203; EP 0895410 A3 20000202; EP 0895410 B1 20040616; DE 69824496 D1 20040722; DE 69824496 T2 20050623; JP H11168638 A 19990622; US 5991512 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080727

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080727

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824496 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHAKED, DORON

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARAD, NUR

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FITZHUGH, ANDREW

2004-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOBEL, IRWIN

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 1/52 A, 7H 04N 1/58 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI