Global Patent Index - EP 0895443 B1

EP 0895443 B1 2002-09-25 - Inrush current limiting circuit

Title (en)

Inrush current limiting circuit

Title (de)

Einschaltstrombegrenzungsschaltung

Title (fr)

Circuit limiteur de courant d'appel

Publication

EP 0895443 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98410084 A

Priority

FR 9710034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895443A1] The lamp (L) is series-connected, across the AC e.g. mains supply (P,N), with a single-pole switch and a peak-lopping circuit based on two MOSFET transistors (M1,M2). The load-carrying current connection between MOSFETs includes a resistance (Rm) providing current-related input levels to bipolar transistors (T1,T2) controlling the MOSFETs. Bypass diodes (D1,D2) ensure one MOSFET is inoperative during positive current half-cycles. The other during negative half-cycles. The series resistor provides current measurement for the relevant control transistor in both half-cycles. In one variant, a single peak-lopper is used, with a full-wave rectifier. In another, a MOSFET is used in a chopping mode. Optionally, IGBTs replace MOSFETs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 39/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895443 A1 19990203; EP 0895443 B1 20020925; DE 69808202 D1 20021031; FR 2767017 A1 19990205; FR 2767017 B1 19991015; US 6445144 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080728

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080728

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808202 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

1999-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI