Global Patent Index - EP 0895455 B1

EP 0895455 B1 2000-07-19 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BRISTLE MATERIAL FOR BRISTLE GOODS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING BRISTLE MATERIAL FOR BRISTLE GOODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BORSTENMATERIAL FÜR BORSTENWAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MATERIAU POUR POILS DE BROSSERIE POUR ARTICLES A POILS DE BROSSERIE

Publication

EP 0895455 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920705 A

Priority

  • DE 19616309 A
  • EP 9701916 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19616309A1] In order to produce bristle material for bristle goods with various types of plastic bristles produced by being extruded as endless monofilaments, various types of endless monofilaments having the desired composition for the finished bristle goods are gathered into a mixed skein and wound up, and the mixed skein is then cut into the lengths of bristle material required for the bristle goods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/08; A46D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A46D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/08 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616309 A1 19971030; AR 006839 A1 19990929; AT 194760 T 20000815; AU 2699097 A 19971112; AU 711567 B2 19991014; BR 9708821 A 19990803; CA 2251868 A1 19971030; CN 1108772 C 20030521; CN 1216906 A 19990519; CZ 9803391 A3 19990317; DE 19780329 D2 19990701; EP 0895455 A1 19990210; EP 0895455 B1 20000719; ES 2148973 T3 20001016; ID 16585 A 19971016; IN 189989 B 20030531; JP 2000508932 A 20000718; KR 20000010632 A 20000225; NO 984984 A 19981222; NO 984984 D0 19981026; PL 329505 A1 19990329; RU 2171611 C2 20010810; TR 9802121 T2 19990322; TW 339365 B 19980901; US 6048478 A 20000411; WO 9739651 A1 19971030; ZA 9703399 B 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120417

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702061

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PEDEX GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PEDEX & CO GMBH, 69483 WALD-MICHELBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59702061

- Effective date: 20110304

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090418

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090418

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090417

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-04-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PEDEX & CO. G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-03 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010403

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-10-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-10-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148973 T3

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702061 20000824

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194760 T 20000815

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE