Global Patent Index - EP 0895485 B1

EP 0895485 B1 2003-06-04 - PLANT FOR COATING OBJECTS WITH FREQUENTLY CHANGING COLOURS

Title (en)

PLANT FOR COATING OBJECTS WITH FREQUENTLY CHANGING COLOURS

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGE ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT HÄUFIG WECHSELNDEM FARBMATERIAL

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE REVETEMENT POUR RECOUVRIR DES OBJETS D'UN MATERIAU COLORANT, A CHANGEMENT FREQUENT DE MATERIAUX COLORANTS

Publication

EP 0895485 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921746 A

Priority

  • DE 19616668 A
  • EP 9702102 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19616668A1] A plant is disclosed for coating objects (6), in particular car bodies, with frequently changing colours (19). A cartridge sorting and storing rack (5) is disclosed in which a plurality of colour cartridges (12, 13, 18) with similar and different colours are stored at certain locations in the rack. These colour cartridges (12, 13) are fetched by means of a controller out of the cartridge sorting and storage rack, depending on the colour nuance desired for the object being painted, and supplied to conveyor means. The conveyor means preferably consists of a ring-shaped, tubular system in which full cartridges (13) are conveyed to a docking station (8) and applicator and back, as in a pneumatic tube conveyor. Unlike conventional ring-shaped conveyor systems with colour exchange valves, this system allows almost any number of colour nuances to be made available with a relatively low constructive outlay of the applicator (9). The costly cleaning of the cartridge transport paths when changing colours may be dispensed with.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 12/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/02 (2006.01); B05B 12/02 (2006.01); B05B 12/14 (2006.01); B07C 5/342 (2006.01); B65G 1/06 (2006.01); B65G 51/04 (2006.01); B65G 1/137 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 12/1463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616668 A1 19971106; EP 0895485 A1 19990210; EP 0895485 B1 20030604; ES 2195140 T3 20031201; WO 9740946 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-07-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170423

2017-05-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170423

2017-04-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59710228

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710228 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010620

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT