Global Patent Index - EP 0895552 B1

EP 0895552 B1 2001-05-16 - PROCESS FOR COATING A BOARD- OR PAPER-LIKE SUBSTRATE WITH A POWDER PAINT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR COATING A BOARD- OR PAPER-LIKE SUBSTRATE WITH A POWDER PAINT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON EINEM KARTON- ODER PAPIERÄHNLICHEN SUBSTRAT MITTELS EINER PULVERLACKZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ENDUCTION D'UN SUBSTRAT DE TYPE CARTON OU PAPIER AU MOYEN D'UNE COMPOSITION DE PEINTURE EN POUDRE

Publication

EP 0895552 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97907487 A

Priority

  • EP 97907487 A
  • EP 96200819 A
  • NL 9700149 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9736049A1] The invention relates to a process for coating a board- or paper-like substrate with a powder paint composition. The powder paint particles are first charged by friction or induction in the presence of magnetic or non-magnetic particles, are next transported and are then applied to the substrate or applied to a transfer medium and subsequently transferred to the substrate, by means of an electric field between the substrate respectively the transfer medium and the means of transport whereafter the powder paint composition is cured or fused to obtain a powder coating and wherein the powder paint particles are based on solid particles of a radiation curable binder. Preferably, the substrate is paper or cardboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/00; B05D 1/00; B05D 7/06; D21H 23/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/06 (2006.01); C09D 5/03 (2006.01); C09D 5/46 (2006.01); D21H 19/00 (2006.01); D21H 19/06 (2006.01); D21H 23/50 (2006.01); G03C 1/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/775 (2006.01); G03G 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/06 (2013.01); B05D 1/007 (2013.01); D21H 19/00 (2013.01); D21H 23/50 (2013.01); B05D 2401/32 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

J.F.HUGHES: "Particle charging for powder coating", May 1986 (1986-05-01), pages 10 - 13

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9736049 A1 19971002; AU 1947897 A 19971017; DE 69704860 D1 20010621; DE 69704860 T2 20020328; EP 0895552 A1 19990210; EP 0895552 B1 20010516; ES 2159390 T3 20011001; JP 2000508007 A 20000627; TW 354269 B 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090324

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DSM N.V.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE DSM N.V.

2004-10-08 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-10-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2004-03-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-11-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DSM N.V.

2003-03-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-03-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-20 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159390 T3

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704860 20010621

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990813

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980914

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE