Global Patent Index - EP 0895660 B1

EP 0895660 B1 2000-06-28 - CABLE PLUG-IN CONNECTOR WITH CONTACT TONGUES PROVIDED WITH SOLDERED CONNECTIONS AND SECURED IN AN INSULATING BODY

Title (en)

CABLE PLUG-IN CONNECTOR WITH CONTACT TONGUES PROVIDED WITH SOLDERED CONNECTIONS AND SECURED IN AN INSULATING BODY

Title (de)

KABELSTECKVERBINDER MIT IN EINEM ISOLATIONSKÖRPER BEFESTIGTEN KONTAKTBAHNEN MIT LÖTANSCHLÜSSEN

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR DE CABLE ENFICHABLE AVEC LANGUETTES DE CONTACT FIXEES DANS UN CORPS ISOLANT ET POURVUES DE CONNEXIONS SOUDEES

Publication

EP 0895660 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97920598 A

Priority

  • DE 9700755 W
  • DE 19615979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740552A1] This invention concerns a cable plug-in connector with an insulating body (1) and with several electrical tongues (2) secured in the insulating body (1). The plug-side ends of the electric contact tongues serve as the contact elements for establishing electrical contact with a counter-connector and their opposite ends are constructed as a soldered connection (4) for a cable conductor. The soldered connection (4) shall have a V-shaped cross section and, together with its back side which is turned away from the cable lead, be embedded in insulating material (1) by spraying with plastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/405; H01R 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/405 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/023 (2013.01); H01R 13/405 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740552 A1 19971030; CA 2252610 A1 19971030; CN 1216639 A 19990512; EP 0895660 A1 19990210; EP 0895660 B1 20000628; JP 3016874 B2 20000306; JP H11508403 A 19990721; TW 344908 B 19981111; US 6066010 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701939 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990129

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981020

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE