Global Patent Index - EP 0895730 A3

EP 0895730 A3 2000-11-22 - Iron

Title (en)

Iron

Title (de)

Bügeleisen

Title (fr)

Fer à repasser

Publication

EP 0895730 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98108168 A

Priority

IT MI971886 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895730A2] An iron (10) especially suitable to be used in footwear and leatherware sectors, comprises a tool (14) tied to a grip and handling body (12), made from metal and provided internally with a plurality of ducts and seats forming one or more chambers (18) and/or (20), for a fluid to be atomised, and an adjoining cavity for a heating body (24), at least one of said chambers having a partly or entirely irregular internal surface (36), communicating with the outside of the tool (14) though a nozzle (32). Preferably, the iron if fed by a system delivering, through an atomising device (14), a mix of air and water let in one of said chambers (18), (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 95/02; D06F 75/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 95/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 95/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895730 A2 19990210; EP 0895730 A3 20001122; BR 9803002 A 19991103; CN 1130999 C 20031217; CN 1207418 A 19990210; IT 1294305 B1 19990324; IT MI971886 A1 19990205; TR 9801077 A2 19990222; TR 9801077 A3 19990222; TW 392019 B 20000601

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 43D 95/02 A, 7D 06F 75/12 B

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI