Global Patent Index - EP 0895734 B1

EP 0895734 B1 2000-01-26 - Device for treating of and/or applying make-up on keratinous fibres

Title (en)

Device for treating of and/or applying make-up on keratinous fibres

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung und/oder zum Schmincken von Keratinfasern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement et/ou le maquillage de fibres kératiniques

Publication

EP 0895734 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401753 A

Priority

FR 9710141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895734A1] The brush has a handle (1.1) to which a core (1.2.1), made of two twisted metallic wires, is fixed. The bristles (1.2.2) are implanted in the core. The core is curved into the arc of a circle near the handle and its free end is bent outwards. The ends of the curve (1.2.1.2, 1.2.1.4) define a narrow gap.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement et/ou le maquillage des fibres kératiniques, ce dispositif comportant au moins un élément de préhension (1.1 ; 2.1 ; 5.1) muni de deux extrémités, une brosse (1.2 ; 2.2 ; 3.2 ; 5.2) comprenant une âme (1.2.1 ; 2.2.1 ; 3.2.1 ; 5.2.1) fixée à une première extrémité (1.2.1.1 ; 2.2.1.1) de l'élément de préhension (1.1 ; 2.1 ; 5.1) et des poils (1.2.2 ; 2.2.2 ; 4.2.2) implantés dans ladite âme (1.2.1 ; 2.2.1 ; 3.2.1 ; 5.2.1), ce dispositif étant caractérisé par le fait que sur au moins une partie de sa longueur l'âme décrit une courbe quasi fermée (1.2.1.3 ; 2.2.1.3 ; 5.2.1.3), la courbe quasi fermée comportant deux extrémités (1.2.1.2 ; 1.2.1.4 ; 2.2.1.2 ; 2.2.1.4), définissant l'ouverture (1.2.1.5 ; 5.2.1.5) de la brosse, séparées par une distance d, la courbe quasi fermée comportant une plus grande largeur D. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/18 (2006.01); A45D 19/02 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A45D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/021 (2013.01); A45D 19/02 (2013.01); A45D 2019/0066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895734 A1 19990210; EP 0895734 B1 20000126; AR 016587 A1 20010725; CA 2243443 A1 19990207; CA 2243443 C 20030401; DE 69800072 D1 20000302; DE 69800072 T2 20000608; ES 2144329 T3 20000601; FR 2767040 A1 19990212; FR 2767040 B1 19990924; JP 3554197 B2 20040818; JP H11113633 A 19990427; US 6003519 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070709

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060710

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060710

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060709

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060709

2005-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144329 T3

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800072 20000302

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-01-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981202

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI