Global Patent Index - EP 0895735 B1

EP 0895735 B1 2002-11-13 - Elongated steel mounting rail

Title (en)

Elongated steel mounting rail

Title (de)

Längliche Montageschiene aus Stahl

Title (fr)

Rail de montage en acier

Publication

EP 0895735 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98202545 A

Priority

NL 1006724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895735A1] The rail is of rectangular cross-section, with holes in a regular pattern. It is 25 to 40 mm wide x 1.5 to 4 mm thick. The diameters of the first (2), second (3) and third (4) holes are respectively 10-14, 8-10 and 6-8 mm. The second and third ones are alongside each other, and the effective cross-sectional area (sic) of the rail is at least 25 sq.mm. The second and third holes can be elongated in the lengthwise direction of the rail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/1408 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895735 A1 19990210; EP 0895735 B1 20021113; DE 59806251 D1 20021219; NL 1006724 C2 19990208

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806251

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806251 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020208

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI