Global Patent Index - EP 0895739 A3

EP 0895739 A3 2000-04-26 - Slat support for the elastic mounting of slats in a bed base

Title (en)

Slat support for the elastic mounting of slats in a bed base

Title (de)

Lagerkörper zur federnden Lagerung von Leisten eines Bettrostes

Title (fr)

Support de lattes pour le montage élastique de lattes d'un sommier à lattes

Publication

EP 0895739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103984 A

Priority

DE 29714024 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895739A2] The mounting block (1) comprises two leg parts (2,7) with a pivot linkage between them, the leg parts being held apart by spring tension. The lower leg (2) is connected by its foot to the longitudinal beam of the frame, and the upper leg (7) is secured through its head (8) to the bed slat. The lower leg can be fitted with a leaf spring (10), for the providing a sprung support of the upper. The two leg parts may consist of a plastics material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/064 (2013.01); A47C 23/063 (2013.01); A47C 23/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29714024 U1 19971218; AT 224162 T 20021015; EP 0895739 A2 19990210; EP 0895739 A3 20000426; EP 0895739 B1 20020918; ES 2181074 T3 20030216

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040308

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECTICEL INTERNATIONALE BETTSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-03-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040306

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181074 T3

2003-02-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030215

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805585 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR NL

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224162 T 20021015

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR NL

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR NL

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI