Global Patent Index - EP 0895792 B1

EP 0895792 B1 2003-06-11 - Multi-piece solid golf ball

Title (en)

Multi-piece solid golf ball

Title (de)

Mehrteiliger, fester Golfball

Title (fr)

Balle de golf solide en plusieurs pièces

Publication

EP 0895792 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98306349 A

Priority

  • JP 22760897 A
  • JP 30797097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895792A1] A multi-piece solid golf ball featuring an increased flight distance, superior control, good feeling, and improved durability is provided. A multi-piece solid golf ball comprising a solid core and a cover having an inner and an outer layer surrounding the core is characterized in that the solid core has a distortion of at least 2.7 mm under an applied load of 100 kg, the inner cover layer is formed mainly of a thermoplastic polyester elastomer, the outer cover layer is formed mainly of a thermoplastic polyurethane elastomer, one or more ionomer resins having a Shore D hardness of at least 55 are mixed with either one or both of the thermoplastic polyester elastomer of the inner cover layer and the thermoplastic polyurethane elastomer of the outer cover layer, the inner cover layer has a Shore D hardness of 28-58, and the outer cover layer has a Shore D hardness of 30-55.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/00 (2006.01); A63B 37/02 (2006.01); A63B 37/04 (2006.01); A63B 37/12 (2006.01); A63B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/0003 (2013.01); A63B 37/0031 (2013.01); A63B 37/0035 (2013.01); A63B 37/0066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895792 A1 19990210; EP 0895792 B1 20030611; DE 69815450 D1 20030717; DE 69815450 T2 20040506; JP 3516124 B2 20040405; JP H11104272 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815450

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130807

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815450 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI