Global Patent Index - EP 0895819 B1

EP 0895819 B1 2002-09-18 - Method and apparatus for forming a connecting portion on a hollow profile

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for forming a connecting portion on a hollow profile

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Montageanbindung an einem Hohlprofil

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour former un élément de jonction sur un profilé creux

Publication

EP 0895819 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113750 A

Priority

DE 19733476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895819A1] The component is shaped by internal pressure to accommodate the mounting component. With the internal pressure in the profiled component less than that needed for shaping, the mounting position (10) is rough-shaped using a punch (5). The latter is then left inside the indented portion while high fluidic pressure is generated inside the profiled component (6), causing the walls (13) of the indented portion to press against the punch external surface. Internal pressure is then released and the punch is extracted, leaving a trough-shaped indentation free to form the mounting position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/10 (2006.01); B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/035 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/24 (2013.01); B21D 22/105 (2013.01); B21D 26/035 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49442 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49805 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895819 A1 19990210; EP 0895819 B1 20020918; DE 19733476 A1 19990218; DE 19733476 C2 19990819; ES 2183263 T3 20030316; US 2003189272 A1 20031009; US 6581263 B1 20030624; US 7024769 B2 20060411

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080724

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080724

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080723

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183263 T3

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805587 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI