Global Patent Index - EP 0895842 A3

EP 0895842 A3 2000-12-13 - Machine for cutting slabs of various materials such as marble, ceramics, terracotta, sandstone, glass and the like into tesserae

Title (en)

Machine for cutting slabs of various materials such as marble, ceramics, terracotta, sandstone, glass and the like into tesserae

Title (de)

Maschine zum Aufschneiden von Platten aus verschiedenen Materialien wie Marmor, Keramik, Terrakotta, Sandstein, Glass oder dergleichen in Mosaiksteinen

Title (fr)

Machine à découper des plaques en matériaux divers tels qu' en marbre, céramique, terre cuite, grès, verre et similaires en pierres mosaiques

Publication

EP 0895842 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98114018 A

Priority

IT BO970501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895842A2] A machine for cutting various materials, such as marble, ceramics, terracotta, sandstone, glass and the like, into tesserae, comprising: guiding elements which are composed of sliding rails (5,8) arranged like the sides of a square; a plurality of carriages (9-12), each whereof has elements (31) for supporting a slab (B) and can slide on the rails; elements (13,21,23) for moving the plurality of carriages (9-12) along the rails (5,8) so that the slabs on the support elements (31) maintain the same orientation along the entire path formed by the rails; and two slab cutting elements (43,44) arranged along two mutually perpendicular sides of the square, each element being constituted by a pack of blades (45,46) which rotate about an axis perpendicular to the respective side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/048 (2013.01); B28D 1/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0895842 A2 19990210; EP 0895842 A3 20001213; EP 0895842 B1 20030212; DE 69811301 D1 20030320; DE 69811301 T2 20031211; ES 2191891 T3 20030916; IT 1294162 B1 19990322; IT BO970501 A1 19990208; IT BO970501 D0 19970807; PT 895842 E 20030630

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-12-31 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Ref Legal Event Code: TE4A

- Free Format Text: SICIS S.R.L. IT

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191891

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-05-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030401541

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69811301

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR PT

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

RO

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB GR PT

2001-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010611

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR PT

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI