Global Patent Index - EP 0895857 B1

EP 0895857 B1 2002-09-25 - Device and method for changing the printing image during the operation of a printing press

Title (en)

Device and method for changing the printing image during the operation of a printing press

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Wechseln des Druckbildes während des Betriebs einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour changer l'image d'impression pendant l'opération d'une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0895857 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113657 A

Priority

US 90873697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6119593A] An apparatus and method allowing the changing of image plates or cassettes in an offset printing apparatus without the need to stop the press. Each blanket cylinder is associated with two image cylinders, where each image cylinder carries an associated image plate or cassette. When one of the image cylinders is engaged with the blanket cylinder, thereby transferring an image for printing on the web, the other image cylinder is disengaged from the blanket cylinder. As a result, the other image cylinder is stopped, allowing the image plate or cassette to be changed without the need to stop the entire press operation. After the image plate or cassette is changed on the stopped image cylinder, that image cylinder may be subsequently engaged with the blanket cylinder, while the other image cylinder is disengaged, thereafter allowing that image cylinder to have its image plate or cassette changed. The present invention can include a driving and clutching arrangement which allows an image cylinder which has been stopped for image plate or cassette exchange to be restarted and engaged with the blanket cylinder, while the other image cylinder which was engaged with the blanket cylinder and printing on the web is stopped. In an alternative embodiment of the present invention, two image cylinders and inking units are mounted together on a frame for lateral movement relative to the blanket cylinder, such that lateral movement of one image cylinder and inking unit away from and out of engagement with the blanket cylinder results in lateral movement of the other image cylinder and inking unit toward and into engagement with the blanket cylinder. In an alternative embodiment, each of the plate cylinders has an auxiliary motor. Each auxiliary motor accelerates and decelerates one of the plate cylinders individually.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/08; B41F 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/04 (2006.01); B41F 7/08 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 31/14 (2006.01); B41F 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/04 (2013.01); B41F 7/08 (2013.01); B41P 2217/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6119593 A 20000919; DE 19832917 A1 19990211; DE 59805665 D1 20021031; DE 59808203 D1 20030605; EP 0895857 A2 19990210; EP 0895857 A3 19990630; EP 0895857 B1 20020925; EP 1157830 A1 20011128; EP 1157830 B1 20030502; JP H1199613 A 19990413; US 5904093 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805665

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805665 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI