Global Patent Index - EP 0895937 B1

EP 0895937 B1 2000-11-29 - Device for applying labels to conical surfaces of articles

Title (en)

Device for applying labels to conical surfaces of articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von Etiketten auf konische Flächen von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer des étiquettes sur des surfaces coniques d'articles

Publication

EP 0895937 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114635 A

Priority

DE 29713877 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0895937A1] The machine comprises a revolving transfer drum (33) with a device for holding labels on its circumference. The holding device is movable at right angles to the drum and formed as vacuum strips (34). A label at the feed station is directed to a vacuum strip on the drum so that the forward edge together with the rotational axis of the drum lies in a common plane. The vacuum strips are positioned at right angles to the drum plane of revolution by a control element, depending upon the rotational position of the transfer drum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/18; B65C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/16 (2006.01); B65C 9/04 (2006.01); B65C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/188 (2013.01); B65C 3/16 (2013.01); B65C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29713877 U1 19980305; AT 197784 T 20001215; EP 0895937 A1 19990210; EP 0895937 B1 20001129; ES 2154922 T3 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160804

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160804

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160804

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060804

2005-08-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154922 T3

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800358 20010104

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197784 T 20001215

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRONES AG

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990823

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990823

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI