Global Patent Index - EP 0896111 B1

EP 0896111 B1 2000-04-05 - Roof lead-through

Title (en)

Roof lead-through

Title (de)

Dachdurchführung

Title (fr)

Traversée de toit

Publication

EP 0896111 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114961 A

Priority

DE 19734378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896111A1] The passage (10) is used through a roof, and comprises a roof ventilation pipe (11). The roof ventilation pipe has an insulation layer on the pipe surfaces above and/or below the roof. An insulation layer is also at the outer surfaces of the hood (16) and at the upper (19) and/or lower surfaces of the dome (14). The insulating layers are in a multi-layer plastics foam structures, preferably with pores between them to contain air.

Abstract (de)

Eine Dachdurchführung (10) ist durch eine Dacheindeckungsplatte (12) hergestellt, die an ihrer Oberseite einen kuppelförmigen, mit einer Durchtrittsöffnung (15) ausgebildeten Dom (14) und an ihrer Unterseite eine Abstützvorrichtung (13) für ein Dachentlüftungsrohr (11) aufweist. Das Dachentlüftungsrohr (11) ist durch die Durchtrittsöffnung (15) hin-durchgeführt. Auf dem Dachentlüftungsrohr (11) ist ein formpassend zum Dom (14) gestaltetes, auf einer Außenseite (19) des Doms (14) zur Anlage kommendes Haubenteil (16) verschieblich. Das Dachentlüftungsrohr (11) kann durch die Verspannung von Haubenteil (16) und Dom (14) ortsfest angeordnet werden. Über und/oder unter Dach angeordnete Rohrflächen des Dachentlüftungsrohrs (11) sind von einer Dämmschicht umgeben. An Oberflächen des Haubenteils (16) ist eine Dämmschicht vorgesehen. An der Oberseite (19) und/oder Unterseite des Domes (14) ist ebenfalls eine Dämmschicht angebracht ist. Die Bildung von Kondenswasser an Innenflächen der Dachdurchführung, insbesondere am Dachentlüftungsrohr, wird möglichst verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/14 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1471 (2013.01); E04D 2001/307 (2013.01); E04D 2001/309 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896111 A1 19990210; EP 0896111 B1 20000405; AT 191530 T 20000415; DE 19734378 A1 19990218; DE 59800117 D1 20000511; DK 0896111 T3 20000717; SI 896111 T1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-05-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020808

2003-04-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-03-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-03-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20020808

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-08-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010830

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010830

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-24 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010803

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-08-03 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010803

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-07-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010727

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE LI LU MC NL SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19990714;LV PAYMENT 19990714;RO PAYMENT 19990714;SI PAYMENT 19990714

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191530

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUERMANN, WOLFRAM

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE LI LU MC NL SE

1999-10-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19990714;LV PAYMENT 19990714;RO PAYMENT 19990714;SI PAYMENT 19990714

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990118

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE LI LU MC NL SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI