Global Patent Index - EP 0896118 B1

EP 0896118 B1 2002-11-06 - Vehicle door lock with electrical locking device

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock with electrical locking device

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürschloss mit elektrischer Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte de véhicule automobile à condamnation électrique

Publication

EP 0896118 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401757 A

Priority

  • FR 9709780 A
  • FR 9712539 A
  • FR 9805604 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896118A1] The use of a coded transmitter device which can be recognised by the electronic system associated with the lock enables operation of the lock by hand pressure alone, without need for operation of button on remote control. The lock includes a forked bolt (2) intended to co-operate with the lock plate, and a pawl (4) which normally ensure the blocking of the bolt in the closed position. The pawl is able to adopt an 'escape' position in which it does not block the bolt. The mechanism for releasing the bolt includes a control (9) which can be operated by the action of the user's hand on the door handle. The control also includes an electrical element responding to the receipt of an unlocking signal from a transmitter which places the mechanism in its active state. The transmitter which is carried by the owner transmits a signal which is detected within the vehicle, and which enables release of the lock when the handle is pressed, whilst the lock remains closed in the absence of this signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10S 292/25 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5978 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896118 A1 19990210; EP 0896118 B1 20021106; BR 9802287 A 19991109; DE 69809152 D1 20021212; DE 69809152 T2 20030821; ES 2186984 T3 20030516; FR 2766861 A1 19990205; FR 2766861 B1 19990903; US 6286878 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809152

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-11-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121122

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186984 T3

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809152 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI