Global Patent Index - EP 0896133 B1

EP 0896133 B1 2002-11-06 - Crankcase ventilating

Title (en)

Crankcase ventilating

Title (de)

Kurbelgehäuse-Entlüftung

Title (fr)

Ventilation du carter moteur

Publication

EP 0896133 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114397 A

Priority

DE 19734001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896133A1] The ventilation for the crankcase, of an internal combustion engine, has a throttle valve (14) in the primary ventilation channel (10), to narrow the cross section of the primary ventilation channel (10) as the engine power loading is reduced. The throttle valve (14) is operated by an actuator according to the underpressure within the intake pipe (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896133 A1 19990210; EP 0896133 B1 20021106; AT 227391 T 20021115; DE 19734001 A1 19990211; ES 2186060 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806156

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227391 T

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, US

- Document: DE 59806156

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC (N. D. GES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS, INC., DETROIT, MICH., US

- Document: DE 59806156

- Effective date: 20110323

2009-12-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091105 AND 20091111

2009-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091029 AND 20091104

2009-04-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090305 AND 20090311

2009-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090219 AND 20090225

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186060 T3

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806156 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227391 T 20021115

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI