Global Patent Index - EP 0896144 A3

EP 0896144 A3 2000-07-12 - Fuel injection control apparatus for an accumulator type engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection control apparatus for an accumulator type engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzungsteuergerät für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Kraftstoffspeicherleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'injection de combustible pour moteur à combustion interne à accumulateur

Publication

EP 0896144 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98114568 A

Priority

JP 20918097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896144A2] A fuel injection control apparatus for an accumulator type engine (1) efficiently reduces fuel pressure in an accumulator pipe (4) if the fuel pressure exceeds a target pressure, thereby ensuring stable combustion. Injectors (2) of a diesel engine (1) are connected to a common rail (4) provided commonly for all the cylinders (#1-#4) of the engine. The common rail (4) is connected to a supply pump (6) by a supply pipe (5). Each injector (2) has a mechanism that injects fuel into the corresponding one of the cylinders (#1-#4) when an electromagnetic valve (3) provided in the injector (2) is driven, and that releases fuel to reduce the fuel pressure in the common rail (4) during an early period (ineffective injection time) after the start of the driving of the electromagnetic valve (3). An electronic control unit (51) executes an ineffective injection control during the ineffective injection control time to reduce the fuel pressure in the common rail (4), if the target injection amount is "0" and the actual fuel pressure is greater than the target fuel pressure. The ineffective injection control time is set to greater values as the fuel temperature decreases. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3872 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02D 41/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896144 A2 19990210; EP 0896144 A3 20000712; JP 3546285 B2 20040721; JP H1150899 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150303

2013-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041209

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980803

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI