Global Patent Index - EP 0896146 B1

EP 0896146 B1 2003-06-25 - Cylinderhead for a crankcase with various cylinder bores

Title (en)

Cylinderhead for a crankcase with various cylinder bores

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf zur Verwendung für Kurbelgehäuse mit unterschiedlichen Zylinderbohrungsdurchmessern

Title (fr)

Culasse pour un carter-moteur à plusieurs alésages

Publication

EP 0896146 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110043 A

Priority

DE 19734007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896146A2] The cylinder head (2) for a crankcase, with cylinder bores of different diameters, matches all the crankcase versions. The mounting points and the gas exchange valves (4a) are identical. The valve seat rings (7) are positioned and dimensioned so that the valve head (6) extends into the cylinder edge section forming the combustion zone portion of the cylinder head (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/42; F02B 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/22 (2006.01); F02B 69/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F01L 3/22 (2013.01); F02B 69/00 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896146 A2 19990210; EP 0896146 A3 19990818; EP 0896146 B1 20030625; DE 19734007 A1 19990211; US 6000372 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808795 P 20030807

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020611

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000205

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI