Global Patent Index - EP 0896151 A3

EP 0896151 A3 2000-03-22 - Synthetic low friction piston for a hydraulic pump or motor

Title (en)

Synthetic low friction piston for a hydraulic pump or motor

Title (de)

Reibungsarmer Kunststoffkolben für hydraulische Pumpen oder Motoren

Title (fr)

Piston en matériau synthéthique à basse friction pour une pompe ou un moteur hydraulique

Publication

EP 0896151 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306172 A

Priority

JP 21188897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896151A2] A hydraulic pump or motor comprises a rotating disk member (31) supported free to rotate in a housing (11), and a cylinder block (14) supported free to rotate in the space of the housing (11) around a rotation axis inclined to the rotation axis of the rotating disk member (31). The rotating disk member (31) and cylinder block (14) are connected by a joint (17), and they are rotated in the same way by a drive shaft (12). A hemispherical shoe (29) in contact with the rotating disk member (31) via a spherical surface and having a smooth surface (29A) on the other side, comes in contact with a pad (27) of synthetic resin attached to the tip of a piston (20). The pad (27) has a smooth support surface (27A) perpendicular to the piston axis, and comes in contact with the smooth surface (29A) of the shoe (29) on this support surface (27A). A pocket (27D) for leading a cylinder internal pressure through the piston is formed on the contact surface between the pad (27) and shoe (29) forming a hydrostatic bearing. Each of the pistons (20) is pushed in the extending direction by a spring (21). A cylindrical piston cap (23) formed of a low friction synthetic resin on the outer circumference of the piston (20) slides in a cylinder bore (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/22 (2006.01); F04B 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/124 (2013.01); F05C 2225/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896151 A2 19990210; EP 0896151 A3 20000322; EP 0896151 B1 20030625; DE 69815766 D1 20030731; DE 69815766 T2 20040506; DK 0896151 T3 20031020; JP 3703610 B2 20051005; JP H1150950 A 19990223; US 6092457 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150803

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150803

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150803

2016-03-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69815766

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080804

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69815766

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPOT

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FI FR GB SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI