Global Patent Index - EP 0896194 B1

EP 0896194 B1 2002-11-06 - Fireplace insert with baking compartment

Title (en)

Fireplace insert with baking compartment

Title (de)

Kamineinsatz mit Backfach

Title (fr)

Insert de cheminée à compartiment de cuisson

Publication

EP 0896194 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114106 A

Priority

DE 29713900 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896194A1] The baking compartment is formed as a separate module to the insert and can be fitted to the insert and removed from it. It has a flue gas inlet connection connectable to the insert flue gas outlet connection and also has a flue gas outlet connection. The insert (1) on its upper side has a flue gas outlet connection (4), which is formed as a pipe connection emerging from the upper side. The baking compartment (2) in module form has its flue gas inlet connection (3) fitted onto the flue gas outlet connection, the flue gas connections being so stably formed that the baking compartment is solely supported by the insert via the flue gas connection union.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/22; F24B 1/02; F24B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/22 (2006.01); F24B 1/28 (2006.01); F24B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 5/00 (2013.01); F24B 1/22 (2013.01); F24B 1/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29713900 U1 19971106; AT 227408 T 20021115; DE 19834898 A1 19990211; DE 19834898 B4 20120524; DK 0896194 T3 20030127; EP 0896194 A1 19990210; EP 0896194 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806157

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806157

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227408 T

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAX *BLANK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-07-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060718

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-29 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806157 20021212

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL SE

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227408 T 20021115

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010723

1999-10-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

1999-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR IT LI NL SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI