Global Patent Index - EP 0896229 A3

EP 0896229 A3 2000-04-19 - Anti-fogging and anti-reflection optical article

Title (en)

Anti-fogging and anti-reflection optical article

Title (de)

Optischer Gegenstand mit Beschlagverhinderungs- und Antireflex-Eigenschaften

Title (fr)

Objets optiques ayant des propriétés anti-buée et antireflet

Publication

EP 0896229 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98114586 A

Priority

JP 21326997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896229A2] Disclosed herein is an anti-fogging and anti-reflection optical article which comprises a substrate, a first water-absorbing film provided on the substrate, a thin film of high refractive index provided on the first water-absorbing film, and a second water-absorbing film provided on the thin film of high refractive index, wherein the first water-absorbing film contains a water-absorbing polymer and provided on the substrate, the thin film of high refractive index comprises a polycondensation product of a hydrolysate of a metal alkoxide, and the second water-absorbing film comprises a water-absorbing polymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 1/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/62 (2006.01); B32B 27/12 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); G02B 1/10 (2006.01); G02B 1/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 1/10 (2013.01); A44B 18/0011 (2013.01); A61F 13/51462 (2013.01); A61F 13/5148 (2013.01); A61F 13/62 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); G02B 1/11 (2013.01); A61F 2013/15544 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24942 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2495 (2013.01); Y10T 428/265 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31638 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31645 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31649 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31667 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896229 A2 19990210; EP 0896229 A3 20000419; EP 0896229 B1 20050406; CN 1090084 C 20020904; CN 1214299 A 19990421; DE 69829612 D1 20050512; DE 69829612 T2 20050908; TW 401515 B 20000811; US 6394613 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160803

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69829612

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829612 P 20050512

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040129

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI