Global Patent Index - EP 0896253 A4

EP 0896253 A4 2000-05-10 - TONER COMPOSITION FOR DEVELOPING ELECTROSTATIC LATENT IMAGE

Title (en)

TONER COMPOSITION FOR DEVELOPING ELECTROSTATIC LATENT IMAGE

Title (de)

TONERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTWIDELUNG ELKTROSTATISCHER BILDER

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE TONER POUR DEVELOPPER UNE IMAGE LATENTE ELECTROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 0896253 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98901577 A

Priority

  • JP 9800545 W
  • JP 2806797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896253A1] The invention in this application relates to a toner composition for electrostatic latent image development which is characterized in that, in a toner composition comprising at least binder resin, colorant and charge control agent, to be used in a print forming method provided with a print fixing device which fixes the toner image on a recording medium by means of a light flash, the concentration of benzene generated by heating for 90 seconds at 330 DEG C is no more than 60 mu g/g, and the invention provides a toner composition for electrostatic latent image development which either extends the filter life or does not require the use of a filter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/08; G03G 9/097; G03G 15/20; G03G 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 9/097 (2006.01); G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2013.01); G03G 9/097 (2013.01); G03G 9/09733 (2013.01); G03G 15/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4539284 A 19850903 - BARBETTA ANGELLO J [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 4 31 March 1998 (1998-03-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199233, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A04, AN 1992-273126, XP002132889
  • See also references of WO 9836327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896253 A1 19990210; EP 0896253 A4 20000510; EP 0896253 B1 20070425; CN 100392520 C 20080604; CN 1219249 A 19990609; CN 1300642 C 20070214; CN 1547080 A 20041117; DE 69837641 D1 20070606; DE 69837641 T2 20080103; JP 4131570 B2 20080813; TW 518453 B 20030121; WO 9836327 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837641

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-09-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837641 P 20070606

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-21 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAGASE, KIMIKAZU

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ISHIYAMA, MASAAKI

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAIRA, TAKASHI

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKAHATA, HIROYUKI

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOTSUDUKA, KOUSUKE

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANO, SHIGEHIRO

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHUJO, YOSHIHIRO

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TORAY ENGINEERING CO., LTD.

2000-05-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03G 9/08 A, 7G 03G 9/097 B, 7G 03G 15/20 B, 7G 03G 9/09 B

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981110

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL