Global Patent Index - EP 0896261 A3

EP 0896261 A3 2001-01-03 - Clock structure

Title (en)

Clock structure

Title (de)

Uhranordnung

Title (fr)

Structure d'instrument horaire

Publication

EP 0896261 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98114176 A

Priority

IT PI970045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896261A2] A new clock structure comprising time indication means (4) and reference means (3) associated to a dial (2) in a specularly inverse way. In clocks with hands (4), the latter rotate anticlockwise, whereas in liquid crystals clocks and the like, figures are specularly inverse. Mirror means (6) may be provided to read the time through the reflected image (2', 3',.4') of the dial (2). The mirror means may comprise a mirror (6) pivoted to the dial (2) and having a reflecting side which, in use faces the dial, whereby the mirror rotation lets the observer to find a position in which he can see in the dial the reflected image (21) of the time to read (31,41). The mirror means may comprise on it reference means (22) to read the time, auxiliary reference means (20) being provided on the dial and on the mirror means (21), whereby the coincidence of the former on the latter allows a right time reading. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 45/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896261 A2 19990210; EP 0896261 A3 20010103; IT 1295600 B1 19990513; IT PI970045 A1 19990129; IT PI970045 D0 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI