Global Patent Index - EP 0896303 A3

EP 0896303 A3 2002-09-04 - Procedure and machine for preparing and expending hot sandwiches, and the resulting hot sandwich

Title (en)

Procedure and machine for preparing and expending hot sandwiches, and the resulting hot sandwich

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zur Zubereitung und zur Ausgabe heisser belegter Brötchen, und so erhaltenes heisses belegtes Brötchen

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine pour la préparation et la distribution de sandwiches chauds, et le sandwich chaud en résultant

Publication

EP 0896303 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500160 A

Priority

ES 9701769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0896303A2] Procedure and machine for preparing and expending hot sandwiches, and the resulting hot sandwich. The procedure consists in first wrapping the formed sandwich (1) in aluminum foil, sulphuretted paper or some other suitable paper (2), placing it in a refrigerating chamber (4) and conveying it to a grill (6), wherefrom, once heated, it is conveyed to a dispenser (18) from where it is removed by the consumer, the sandwich also being liable to be provided to said dispenser on a tray (7). The machine comprises a refrigerating chamber (4); two doors (14, 20), one (14) for closing the chamber, inside of which at least one carrousel (8) is provided for storing the wrapped sandwiches (3), and another (20) for closing over the first door and forming a second chamber inside of which is fitted the grill (6) for heating the sandwich (3) received through an opening (15) of the first door (14); a dispenser (18), where the sandwich is moved for dispensing; and a tray (7) storage unit (21). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/10; G07F 11/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/0078 (2013.01); G07F 9/105 (2013.01); G07F 11/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896303 A2 19990210; EP 0896303 A3 20020904; ES 2137860 A1 19991216; ES 2137860 B1 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-01-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 9/10 20060101ALI20131122BHEP

2014-01-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 11/16 20060101AFI20131122BHEP

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 9/10 A, 7G 07F 11/58 B

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI